Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2659 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022