LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2664
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2664
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2664
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 1, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
June 20, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
July 15, 2022
Analysis
June 23, 2022
Analysis
June 22, 2022
Analysis
March 18, 2022
Analysis
March 2, 2022
Analysis
February 23, 2022
Analysis
February 10, 2022
Chaptered
Bill
July 8, 2022
Compare