Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2673 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 24, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 15, 2022
Analysis June 24, 2022
Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2022