Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022