Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2693 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 14, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 15, 2022
Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis April 11, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2022