Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2706 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 REFERENCE TITLE: nutrition; health; pilot programs; grants State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 HB 2706 Introduced by Representatives Shah: Longdon AN ACT Establishing the food as medicine grant pilot program; appropriating monies. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
22
33
44
55
66
77
88
99 REFERENCE TITLE: nutrition; health; pilot programs; grants
1010 State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
1111 HB 2706
1212 Introduced by Representatives Shah: Longdon
1313
1414 REFERENCE TITLE: nutrition; health; pilot programs; grants
1515
1616
1717
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424 State of Arizona
2525
2626 House of Representatives
2727
2828 Fifty-fifth Legislature
2929
3030 Second Regular Session
3131
3232 2022
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737
3838
3939
4040 HB 2706
4141
4242
4343
4444 Introduced by
4545
4646 Representatives Shah: Longdon
4747
4848
4949
5050
5151
5252 AN ACT
5353
5454
5555
5656 Establishing the food as medicine grant pilot program; appropriating monies.
5757
5858
5959
6060
6161
6262 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
6363
6464
6565
6666 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Food as medicine grant pilot program; grants; reporting requirements; delayed repeal A. The three-year food as medicine grant pilot program is established in the department of health services to pilot innovative solutions highlighting the link between nutrition, diet-related illnesses and poor health outcomes. B. The department of health services shall establish at least five grant-funded pilot programs and, on or before March 1, 2023, shall award grants to entities to address the following: 1. Nutrition education. 2. Access to healthy food for children, families and the elderly. 3. Strengthening local and state food supply chains focusing on Arizona agriculture. 4. Reducing the incidence of diet-related diseases, such as diabetes and heart disease. 5. Integrating health care delivery systems with food and nutrition programming in schools and communities. C. The department of health services shall award grants over a three-year period with at least two of the five grants awarded to recipients in rural service areas in this state. The department shall prioritize grant applicants that demonstrate collaboration across multiple sectors of the community, stakeholder groups and disciplines. D. On or before November 1, 2024 and June 1, 2026, the department of health services shall report on the progress of the pilot programs and the impact of the funding on the pilot programs' goals, respectively, to the governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the president of the senate and the chairpersons of the health and human services committees of the house of representative and the senate, or their successor committees, and shall provide a copy of the report to the secretary of state's office. E. This section is repealed from and after June 30, 2026. Sec. 2. Appropriation; department of health services; food as medicine grant pilot program; exemption A. The sum of $5,000,000 is appropriated from the state general fund in fiscal year 2022-2023 to the department of health services to provide grants through the food as medicine grant pilot program established by this act. B. The appropriation made in subsection A of this section is exempt from the provisions of section 35-190, Arizona Revised Statutes, relating to the lapsing of appropriations. Any monies remaining unspent on July 1, 2026 revert to the state general fund.
6767
6868 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
6969
7070 Section 1. Food as medicine grant pilot program; grants; reporting requirements; delayed repeal
7171
7272 A. The three-year food as medicine grant pilot program is established in the department of health services to pilot innovative solutions highlighting the link between nutrition, diet-related illnesses and poor health outcomes.
7373
7474 B. The department of health services shall establish at least five grant-funded pilot programs and, on or before March 1, 2023, shall award grants to entities to address the following:
7575
7676 1. Nutrition education.
7777
7878 2. Access to healthy food for children, families and the elderly.
7979
8080 3. Strengthening local and state food supply chains focusing on Arizona agriculture.
8181
8282 4. Reducing the incidence of diet-related diseases, such as diabetes and heart disease.
8383
8484 5. Integrating health care delivery systems with food and nutrition programming in schools and communities.
8585
8686 C. The department of health services shall award grants over a three-year period with at least two of the five grants awarded to recipients in rural service areas in this state. The department shall prioritize grant applicants that demonstrate collaboration across multiple sectors of the community, stakeholder groups and disciplines.
8787
8888 D. On or before November 1, 2024 and June 1, 2026, the department of health services shall report on the progress of the pilot programs and the impact of the funding on the pilot programs' goals, respectively, to the governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the president of the senate and the chairpersons of the health and human services committees of the house of representative and the senate, or their successor committees, and shall provide a copy of the report to the secretary of state's office.
8989
9090 E. This section is repealed from and after June 30, 2026.
9191
9292 Sec. 2. Appropriation; department of health services; food as medicine grant pilot program; exemption
9393
9494 A. The sum of $5,000,000 is appropriated from the state general fund in fiscal year 2022-2023 to the department of health services to provide grants through the food as medicine grant pilot program established by this act.
9595
9696 B. The appropriation made in subsection A of this section is exempt from the provisions of section 35-190, Arizona Revised Statutes, relating to the lapsing of appropriations. Any monies remaining unspent on July 1, 2026 revert to the state general fund.