Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 6, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022