Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2731 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 26, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022