Senate
|
06/24/2022
|
Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-14-6-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (42-17-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-1-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Assigned to House WM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|