Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2780 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill February 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 24, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022