Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Assigned to Senate GOV Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
House miscellaneous motion: Representative Bolick motioned that the House extend its action of Thursday, February 24, 2022, whereby it passed the motion to reconsider its third reading action of HB 2783 and that the time for reconsideration be extended another 14 days. Motion passed v/v.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Assigned to House GE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|