Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 18, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 11, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022