03/17/2022 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |||
House | 03/16/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (0-0-0-) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |