LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR2015
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HCR2015
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HCR2015
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 13, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
June 23, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 22, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 28, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 23, 2022
Analysis
June 20, 2022
Analysis
March 17, 2022
Analysis
February 22, 2022
Analysis
February 11, 2022
Analysis
February 7, 2022