Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 12/03/2021 | Prefile |