LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1021
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1021
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1021
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 10, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
June 24, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
July 7, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 29, 2022
Analysis
June 24, 2022
Analysis
May 11, 2022
Analysis
March 24, 2022
Analysis
March 21, 2022
Analysis
February 24, 2022
Analysis
January 14, 2022