Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1041 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022