Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022