House | 06/23/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate COM Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 12/27/2021 | Prefile |