Senate | 03/14/2022 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-14-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 12/27/2021 | Prefile |