Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1076 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 20, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022