House
|
03/28/2022
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Assigned to House GE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Prefile
|
|
|