Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill January 31, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022