House | 03/28/2022 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | Prefile |