Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1092 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022