LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1094
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1094
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1094
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 6, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 15, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
March 2, 2022
Analysis
February 28, 2022
Analysis
January 27, 2022