House | 03/01/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Prefile |