Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1118 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 22, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis June 22, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022