Senate | 03/09/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Prefile |