Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |