Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 26, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 12, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022