Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1164 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 6, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 1, 2022