Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 24, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 24, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022