LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1175
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1175
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1175
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 12, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 3, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
March 14, 2022
Analysis
March 7, 2022
Analysis
January 21, 2022