Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 6, 2022
Analysis April 20, 2022
Analysis April 19, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 3, 2022