House
|
06/23/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|