Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1192 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 8, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022