House | 03/28/2022 | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-3-1-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |