Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1204 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 17, 2022
Analysis April 11, 2022
Analysis April 7, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 25, 2022