House | 03/02/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |