Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 28, 2022
Analysis April 7, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 20, 2022