Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1235 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 03/24/2022

                            Senate Engrossed   acupuncture board; continuation           State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022           CHAPTER 37       SENATE BILL 1235          An Act   repealing section 41-3022.25, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.25; relating to the acupuncture board of examiners.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

Senate Engrossed   acupuncture board; continuation
State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
CHAPTER 37
SENATE BILL 1235

Senate Engrossed

 

acupuncture board; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

Senate

Fifty-fifth Legislature

Second Regular Session

2022

 

 

 

CHAPTER 37

 

SENATE BILL 1235

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3022.25, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.25; relating to the acupuncture board of examiners.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3022.25, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.25, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.25. Acupuncture board of examiners; termination July 1, 2030 A. The acupuncture board of examiners terminates on July 1, 2030. B. Title 32, chapter 39 and this section are repealed on JANUARY 1, 2031. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the acupuncture board of examiners to promote the safe and professional practice of acupuncture. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3022.25, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.25, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3030.25. Acupuncture board of examiners; termination July 1, 2030

A. The acupuncture board of examiners terminates on July 1, 2030.

B. Title 32, chapter 39 and this section are repealed on JANUARY 1, 2031. END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the acupuncture board of examiners to promote the safe and professional practice of acupuncture.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 23, 2022.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 23, 2022. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 23, 2022.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 23, 2022.