Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1262 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 29, 2022
Analysis June 22, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022