House
|
03/16/2022
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-3-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|