Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1275 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022