Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1309 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/28/2022

                      	SB 1309 
Initials AG 	Page 1 	House Engrossed 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-fifth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: HHS DPA 8-0-0-0 | 3
rd
 Read 28-0-2-0 
House: HHS DPA/SE 9-0-0-0 
 
SB 1309: group home monitoring; complex needs 
NOW: temporary licenses; health professionals; extension 
Sponsor: Senator Barto, LD 15 
House Engrossed 
Overview 
An emergency measure stating that any temporary license issued by a health profession 
regulatory board to a health professional during the Governor's declaration of emergency related 
to Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19) and that was active on March 1, 2022, does not expire 
until January 1, 2023. 
History 
The Governor may proclaim a state of emergency that takes effect immediately in an area affected 
or likely to be affected if the Governor finds that circumstances exist meeting the statutory 
definition of a state of emergency (A.R.S. § 26-303). On March 11, 2020, the Governor issued a 
declaration of emergency and has since issued additional executive orders relating to COVID-19.  
An Arizona health profession regulatory board may issue a temporary license to allow an applicant 
to practice if the applicant: 1) holds an active and unrestricted health profession license in this 
state, territory or possession of the United States; 2) has never had a health profession license 
suspended or revoked; 3) is not subject of an unresolved complaint against their health profession 
license; and 4) has paid any applicable fees. A health regulatory board may suspend, deny or 
revoke a temporary license and deny the application for initial licensure if the applicant has 
misrepresented the notarized affidavit attesting that the applicant meets the requirements of their 
respective licensing board.  
A health profession regulatory board must approve or deny an application within 30 days after an 
applicant submits a complete application. If the temporary license is granted, it expires 30 days 
after the date the license was granted or on approval or denial of their submitted license 
application (A.R.S. § 32-1234).  
Provisions 
1. Stipulates that any temporary license issued by a health profession regulatory board to a 
health professional during the Governor's declaration of emergency related to COVID-19 and 
that was active March 1, 2022, does not expire until January 1, 2023. (Sec. 1) 
2. Clarifies terms. (Sec. 1) 
3. Repeals on July 1, 2023. (Sec. 1) 
4. Contains an emergency clause. (Sec. 2) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☒ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note