Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1309 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 28, 2022