Senate
|
06/24/2022
|
Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (14-11-5-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Assigned to House WM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate FIN Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|