Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 6, 2022
Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022