Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 20, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 12, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022